+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Rogers (principal House author)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor