+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Dollens (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Floyd
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3