+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Matthews (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Shumate
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor