+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Banking and Financial Services Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking and Financial Services
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McCall (principal House author)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 11