+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Measure failed: Ayes: 10 Nays: 36
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- CCR read
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCs named Daniels, Dahm, Leewright, Paxton, Brooks, Floyd
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Bice; authored by Senator Daniels
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Osburn and substitute with Representative Lepak
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- House Rule suspended
- Enacting clause stricken
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 17
- Referred for engrossment
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 16, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 27
April 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 7
April 9, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2