+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
- HAs adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
- Title restored
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Transportation Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12
- Title stricken
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 5, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor