+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Strom
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock, Lawson, Humphrey, Baker, West (Tammy), Luttrell, Patzkowsky, Sims, Burns, Hardin (David), McEntire, Newton, Smith, Marti
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 26; Ayes: 6 Nays: 80
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
- Coauthored by Representative(s) O'Donnell, Osburn, Martinez, Wright, McDugle, Mize, Miller, Olsen, Phillips, Strom, Townley, Frix, Sneed, Manger, Roberts (Dustin), Stark, Echols, Conley, Davis, West (Kevin), Hill, Sterling, Taylor, Sanders, Ortega, CrosswhiteHader, Caldwell (Chad), Gann, Pae, Kerbs, Boatman, Boles, Moore, McBride, Kiger, Russ, Fincher, Nollan, Roberts (Sean), Pfeiffer, Randleman, Steagall
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Rules
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
- Referred for engrossment
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Authored by Senator Daniels
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 22, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2019: House Emergency
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 80
- Absent: 15
April 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor