+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29; Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
- General Order
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dossett
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 10
April 8, 2019: House Emergency
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 18
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
February 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1