+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 14, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor