+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- Remove Senator Holt as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Treat
- General Order
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Matthews
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hall (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor