+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Boren
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Daniels
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor