+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
- Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Paxton
- Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24
- HAs adopted
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to suspend rule failed
- General Order
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 40
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10
- Referred for engrossment
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Paxton
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 8, 2017: Senate Reconsider
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 6
May 8, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 12
May 4, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 16
April 26, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 6
April 17, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 7
April 10, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 14
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor