+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- CCR adopted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 20
- To Senate
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, to House
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- CCR read
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCs named Holt, Justice, Dahm, Griffin, Treat, Floyd, Sparks
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 25
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 19
April 15, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor