+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees unable to agree
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Weaver
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5