+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 34; Ayes: 25 Nays: 47
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- General Order
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
- General Order, Amended
- Title restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
- Emergency clause restored
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sears (principal House author)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources sub-committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Justice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 4
April 14, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 28