+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
- Title restored
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Jordan (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Coates
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
April 17, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
February 26, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor