+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
- CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Grego (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dossett
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 2
April 3, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor