+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Young
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Coleman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor