+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Hickman
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Casey (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
April 8, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
March 11, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2