+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (59)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
- CCR adopted
- CCR submitted
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- CCR read
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCs named Simpson, Smalley, Rosino, Pugh, Ikley-Freeman, Young
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Scott
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kidd
- Coauthored by Representative Baker
- Coauthored by Representative McCall
- Coauthored by Representative Boles
- Coauthored by Representative Munson
- Coauthored by Representative Marti
- Coauthored by Representative Davis
- HAs read
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Amended
- Third Reading rescinded
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
- Recalled from engrossment
- Enacting clause restored
- Returned to General Order
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
- Title restored
- Emergency added
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 22, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
April 17, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 76
- Absent: 25
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
April 3, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor