+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Shaw
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1