+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Special Session Conference Committee
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 5
- Enacting clause stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Thompson, Hall, Floyd
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
- General Order, Amended
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 20, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor