+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Brecheen
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Gann
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Coody
- Coauthored by Bennett (John)
- Coauthored by Faught
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6