+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Shaw
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 26, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5