+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Branan
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Fields
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brumbaugh (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading