+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
- HAs adopted
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
- General Order
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Weaver
- Remove Representative Meredith as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Meredith
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Meredith (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
April 2, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 3