+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rader
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor