+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 28
- Emergency removed
- Amended
- General Order
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
May 4, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 7
April 3, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor