+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Motion expired
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nollan
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 73
- General Order
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 73
- Absent: 4
March 29, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10