+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Boggs
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Daniels
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Absent: 19
April 2, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
February 25, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor