+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 4, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 3
April 18, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 13
April 11, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
March 7, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor