+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Transportation Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4