+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/14/2014
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23; Ayes: 81 Nays: 8
- JCR adopted
- General Order
- Considered
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sears
- Coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Justice
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 5, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 8