+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 9
- HAs adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Pfeiffer
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20; Ayes: 55 Nays: 32
- General Order
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pfeiffer (principal House author)
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Justice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 11
April 15, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 12