+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3
- General Order
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Murphey (principal House author)
- Referred to Appropriations
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Griffin
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bingman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor