+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
March 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
February 25, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3