+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0; Ayes: 49 Nays: 23
- General Order
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources sub-committee
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Armes (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 22
March 24, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor