+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- CCR submitted
- To Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Coauthored by Senator Sharp
- Enrolled, to House
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCs named Pemberton, Stanislawski, Haste, Quinn, Dossett, Ikley-Freeman
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 22, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
May 22, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
February 18, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor