+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
- Coauthored by Hulbert (principal House author)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading