+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, to House
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCs named Newberry, Brown, Sharp, Ford, Shumate, Ellis
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
- Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wood
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 27, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8