+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
April 9, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4