+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Rosino
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor