+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Newell (principal House author)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brecheen
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 31, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor