+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator David
- Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Simpson
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
March 9, 2022: Senate Department Authority. Effective Date.
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor