+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 4
- General Order
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Nelson
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance)
- Enacting clause stricken
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
March 31, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1