+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10
- Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 13
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Loveless
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor