+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 9, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 1