+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
March 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5