+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sharp
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3