+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCs named Leewright, Paxton, Garvin, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor